- About us
- Investor Relations
- Corporate Governance
Corporate Governance
- Life Insurance
- General Insurance
Corporate Governance
Constitution of the Company
Board of Directors Charter
Anti-Bribery and Corruption Policy
Whistleblowing Programme
Details on Board Composition
Board of Directors
Board Committees Composition (as at 24 April 2024)
Board Committee |
Composition |
Board Audit Committee |
Mr Siew Kah Toong (Chairman) Mr Norman Ip Mr Ou Shian Waei |
Board Nominations and Remuneration Committee |
Mr Foong Soo Hah (Chairman) Mr Norman Ip Mr David Siew |
Board Risk Management Committee |
Ms Mimi Sze Ho (Chairperson) Mr Norman Ip Mr Ou Shian Waei Mr Foong Soo Hah |
Appointments, Resignations and Removals of Directors during the Financial Year 2024 (as at 24 April 2024)
- Ms Mimi Sze Ho (appointed on 1 March 2024)
- Mr Tan Yam Pin (resigned w.e.f. 18 April 2024)
Training and Education Provided to the Board during the Financial Year 2024 (as at 24 April 2024)
The Company has in place an In-House Orientation Programme for newly appointed Directors to familiarize themselves with its operations. The Directors are provided with the opportunity for relevant training programmes on an ongoing basis in areas relating to financial industry for them to keep abreast with the latest developments in the industry including the Financial Institutions Directors’ Education (“FIDE”) Core Programme which promotes high-impact Boards by strengthening Board competencies in dealing with corporate governance, risk management and strategic issues faced by the financial services industry.
During the financial year, the Directors, collectively or on their own, attended seminars, courses and briefing organized by professional bodies and regulatory authorities as well as those conducted in-house, among others as follows:
- FIDE FORUM Fireside Chat with Former Central Bank Governors on “Central Banking in an Evolving International Financial System
- Anti Bribery and Corruption Post Implementation of Adequate Procedures
- International/Domestic Policies and Trends of Money Laundering, Terrorist Financing/Proliferation Financing
Number of Meetings convened by Board and Board Committees in Financial Year 2024 (as at 24 April 2024)
Board / Board Committee | Number of meetings |
Board | 6 |
Board Audit Committee | 5(1) |
Board Nominations and Remuneration Committee | 4 |
Board Risk Management Committee | 4 |
(1) The Board Audit Committee Meetings included 1 Joint Board Audit Committee – Board Risk Management Committee Meeting
Board Committees Composition (as at 22 April 2024)
Board Committee | Composition |
---|---|
Board Audit Committee | Mdm Tan Fong Sang (Chairman) Mr Norman Ka Cheung Ip Mr Lai Chin Tak |
Board Nominations and Remuneration Committee | Mr Lai Chin Tak (Chairman) Mr Norman Ka Cheung Ip Mdm Tan Fong Sang |
Board Risk Management Committee | Mr Tong Hon Keong (Chairman) Mr Lai Chin Tak Mr Norman Ka Cheung Ip |
Appointments, Resignations and Removals of Directors during the Financial Year 2024 (as at 22 April 2024)
- YBhg Datuk Kamaruddin bin Taib (resigned w.e.f. 18 April 2024)
Training and Education Provided to the Board during the Financial Year 2024 (as at 22 April 2024)
The Company has in place an In-House Orientation Programme for newly appointed Directors to familiarize themselves with its operations. The Directors are provided with the opportunity for relevant training programmes on an ongoing basis in areas relating to financial industry for them to keep abreast with the latest developments in the industry including the Financial Institutions Directors’ Education (“FIDE”) Core Programme which promotes high-impact Boards by strengthening Board competencies in dealing with corporate governance, risk management and strategic issues faced by the financial services industry.
During the financial year, the Directors, collectively or on their own, attended seminars, courses and briefing organized by professional bodies and regulatory authorities as well as those conducted in-house, among others as follows:
- FIDE FORUM Fireside Chat with Former Central Bank Governors on "Central Banking in an Evolving International Financial System"
- Managing Culture to Prevent Misconduct
- What Amounts to a Conflict of Interest by Directors?
- Directors Masterclass Series: What Directors Must Know: Recent Developments in Climate Science
- BNM-FIDE FORUM Responsibility Mapping Engagement with Directors of Financial Institutions
Number of Meetings convened by Board and Board Committees in Financial Year 2024 (as at 22 April 2024)
Board / Board Committee | Number of meetings |
Board | 4 |
Board Audit Committee | 3(1) |
Board Nominations and Remuneration Committee | 4 |
Board Risk Management Committee | 3 |
(1) The Board Audit Committee Meetings included 1 Joint Board Audit Committee – Board Risk Management Committee Meeting